GA HR962 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by general law for local referenda to authorize assessment of residential homesteaded property owned by individuals of certain ages at 20 percent of its fair market value regarding local school district taxes for educational purposes; to provide for the repeal of such assessments; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local school district tax; authorize assessment of residential homesteaded property owned by individuals of certain ages at 20 percent of its fair market value; authorize General Assembly - CA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #512 (Y: 163 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-02-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2020-01-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback