GA HR944 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION expressing concern regarding organ harvesting in the People's Republic of China; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

People's Republic of China; organ harvesting; express concern

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #724 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-19HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-12HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback