GA HR940 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION encouraging Georgia to host the world's largest startup pitch competition; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia; host the world's largest startup pitch competition; encourage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback