GA HR935 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Georgia Commission on Freight and Logistics; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Commission on Freight and Logistics; create
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] |
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #640 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Vote #450 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Vote #450 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 605 | |
2020-08-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House Hopper |