GA HR913 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Incorporating Law Enforcement in the Pathway to Treatment and Social Services for Persons Having Challenges with Drug Use and Mental Health; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Study Committee on Incorporating Law Enforcement in the Pathway to Treatment and Social Services for Persons Having Challenges with Drug Use and Mental Health; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - House - House Vote #760 (Y: 158 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-22HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-19HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback