GA HR902 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION compensating Mr. Joseph Samuel Watkins; and for other purposes.
Title
Watkins, Mr. Joseph Samuel; compensate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Adopt: House Vote #618 (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66345 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/221968 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66345#23090 |