GA HR894 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide that the General Assembly shall be entitled to specifically appropriate all unanticipated federal funding allocated to the state for a fiscal year if the sum of all such funds exceeds $100 million for a fiscal year; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; appropriate all unanticipated federal funding allocated for a fiscal year if the sum exceeds $100 million; provide - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Camp [R] | Rep. Marvin Lim [D] | Rep. Sheri Gilligan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-01 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/62508 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/208018 |