GA HR888 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on Converting Closed Hospitals to Veterans Homes; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Study Committee on Converting Closed Hospitals to Veterans Homes; create

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-18HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback