GA HR866 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Special Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Special Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on the Establishment of a State Space Commission; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Study Committee on the Establishment of a State Space Commission; create
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Rep. Brad Raffensperger [R] | Rep. Jeff Jones [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Don Hogan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-10 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-09 | House | House Hopper |
2017-11-29 | House | House Prefiled |