GA HR686 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION encouraging the United States Congress to enact broad and permanent tax reform in 2015 so as to create a tax system that is simpler, flatter, and fairer; and for other purposes.
Title
United States Congress; enact broad and permanent tax reform in 2015 to create a tax system that is simpler, flatter, and fairer; encourage
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-19 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-18 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44752 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/151492 |