GA HR655 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION recognizing Gold Star Father Day on November 9 annually in Georgia; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gold Star Father Day; November 9 annually in Georgia; recognize

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #671 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-22HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-20HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback