GA HR645 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Special Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION commending the many contributions Caribbean Americans have made to the State of Georgia and the United States and recognizing March 22, 2017, as Caribbean American Day at the state capitol; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Caribbean Americans; contributions made to the State of Georgia; commend and recognize

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-22HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-20HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback