GA HR642 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION recommending that NOAA Fisheries rescind the closure of federal waters of offshore Georgia for the period from April 15, 2017, through May 31, 2017, to allow Georgia anglers and saltwater fishing guides a fair and equitable opportunity to enjoy a public resource in keeping with the spirit and intent of the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NOAA Fisheries; rescind closure of federal waters of offshore Georgia for the period from April 15, 2017 through May 31, 2017; recommend

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #379 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-30HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-20HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback