GA HR629 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House State Health Benefit Plan Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
House State Health Benefit Plan Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61378 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/204043 |