GA HR627 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Mental Health and Addiction Treatment Funding Mechanisms; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Study Committee on Mental Health and Addiction Treatment Funding Mechanisms; create

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-16HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-15HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback