GA HR593 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION compensating Mr. Dennis Arnold Perry; and for other purposes.
Title
Perry, Mr. Dennis Arnold; compensate
Sponsors
Rep. Don Hogan [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Rep. Buddy DeLoach [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Rep. Brian Prince [D] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #881 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Adopt: House Vote #712 (Y: 157 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Adopt: House Vote #712 (Y: 157 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-05-02 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 802 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-14 | House | House Hopper |