GA HR591 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Workforce Housing; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Workforce Housing; create
Sponsors
Rep. Vance Smith [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] |
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #332 (Y: 118 N: 46 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56102 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/185372 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56102#17102 |