GA HR590 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Georgia's Barriers to Access to Adequate Health Care; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Georgia's Barriers to Access to Adequate Health Care; create
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Bennett [D] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. David Dreyer [D] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] |
Rep. Shelly Hutchinson [D] | Sen. Josh McLaurin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #353 (Y: 148 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hopper |