GA HR586 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the United States Congress to refrain from cuts to the F-35 Joint Strike Fighter program; and for other purposes.
Title
United States Congress; F-35 Joint Strike Fighter Program; urge refrain cuts
Sponsors
Rep. R Bryant [D] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Hank Huckaby [R] | Rep. Butch Parrish [R] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #365 - Uncontested Resolutions (Y: 157 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-14 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-30 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-16 | House First Readers |