GA HR57 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Elementary and Secondary School Nutrition Programs Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Elementary and Secondary School Nutrition Programs Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #370 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-24 | House | House Hopper |