GA HR553 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Cyberbullying; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Study Committee on Cyberbullying; create

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-18HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback