GA HR52 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION encouraging all schools, local educational agencies, and the state educational agency to recognize that dyslexia has a profound educational impact that must be addressed; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; all schools, local educational agencies and state educational agency to recognize that dyslexia has a profound educational impact that must be addressed; encourage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #277 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback