GA HR502 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by general law for the dedication of revenues derived from fees or other assessments to the public purpose for which such fees or other assessments were imposed; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; provide for dedication of revenues derived from fees or other assessments to the public purpose for which such fees or other assessments were imposed; authorize - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] |
Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-25 | House | House Hopper |