GA HR48 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION supporting Georgia's coastal tourism and fisheries and opposing seismic testing and oil and gas drilling activities off of Georgia's coast; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia's coastal tourism and fisheries; support

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #369 (Y: 125 N: 36 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-04-02HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-29HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback