GA HR48 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION supporting Georgia's coastal tourism and fisheries and opposing seismic testing and oil and gas drilling activities off of Georgia's coast; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia's coastal tourism and fisheries; support
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Rep. Don Hogan [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Samuel Park [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #369 (Y: 125 N: 36 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54340 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/179788 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54340#17199 |