GA HR467 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Georgia Department of Transportation to study the potential costs and benefits of extending Interstate 185 and extending and expanding Georgia 300; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Department of Transportation; study potential costs and benefits of extending Interstate 185 and extending and expanding Georgia 300; urge
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Winfred Dukes [D] | Rep. John LaHood [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] |
Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - Adopt: House Vote #752 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 41) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-29 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/60698 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201446 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/60698#19552 |