GA HR446 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Johnny Tolbert III House Study Committee on Heatstroke; and for other purposes.
Title
Johnny Tolbert III House Study Committee on Heatstroke; create
Sponsors
Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] |
Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-28 | House | House Hopper |