GA HR406 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Georgia Emergency Operations Plan to prioritize the continuum of the long-term services and support system; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Emergency Operations Plans; prioritize the continuum of the long-term services and support system; urge
Sponsors
Rep. John LaHood [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - Adopt: House Vote #308 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-17 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/60534 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/200634 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/60534#18631 |