GA HR319 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize local boards of education to impose, levy, and collect a 1 percent sales and use tax for maintenance and operation expenses of the local school system; to provide for submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boards of education; impose, levy and collect a 1 percent sales and use tax for maintenance and operation expenses of local school system; authorize - CA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-17HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback