GA HR319 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize local boards of education to impose, levy, and collect a 1 percent sales and use tax for maintenance and operation expenses of the local school system; to provide for submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Boards of education; impose, levy and collect a 1 percent sales and use tax for maintenance and operation expenses of local school system; authorize - CA
Sponsors
Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50692 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/165623 |