GA HR279 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION designating March 21 of each year as Single Parent Day; and for other purposes.
Title
Single Parent Day; March 21; designate each year
Sponsors
Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] |
Rep. Paulette Rakestraw [R] | Rep. Doreen Carter [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #626 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #197 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #197 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-07 | Act 440 | |
2018-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House Hopper |