GA HR259 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the Johnny Tolbert III House Study Committee on Heat-Related Injuries, Cardiac Injuries, and Other Sports-Related Injuries; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Johnny Tolbert III House Study Committee on Heat-Related Injuries, Cardiac Injuries, and other Sports-Related Injuries; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #250 (Y: 165 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-18HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-20HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-19HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback