GA HR25 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION honoring the life of Senior Airman Tre Francesco Porfirio and dedicating an intersection in his memory; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senior Airman Tre Francesco Porfirio Memorial Intersection; Camden County; dedicate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #392 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #288 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #225 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09 Effective Date
2017-05-09 Act 280
2017-05-09HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-30HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-23HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-12HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback