GA HR239 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION designating the Savannah Logistics Technology Innovation Corridor as an official technology innovation corridor in Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
Savannah Logistics Technology Innovation Corridor; designate
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #331 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #87 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #87 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 308 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House Hopper |