GA HR238 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by general law for an annual allocation of 75 percent of the revenue derived from the state sales and use tax with respect to the sale of outdoor recreation equipment to a trust fund to be used for the protection and preservation of conservation land; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; annual allocation of 75 percent of revenue from sale of outdoor recreation equipment for protection and preservation of conservation land; provide - CA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #804 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #757 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #701 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #647 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07 Effective Date
2018-05-07 Act 414
2018-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-27SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-15HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-10HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HR/238
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/164988.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/172986.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/173966.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175610.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/177297.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178184.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178962.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15880
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16351
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16252
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16206
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16198

Bill Comments

feedback