GA HR222 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Annexation; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Annexation; create
Sponsors
Rep. Victor Anderson [R] | Rep. Brad Thomas [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Rep. Dale Washburn [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Adopt: House Vote #408 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-24 | House | House Hopper |