GA HR2 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide that the office of any state, county, or municipal elected official shall be declared vacant upon such elected official qualifying for certain other offices; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Elected officials; office shall be declared vacant upon official qualifying for certain other offices; provide - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Donna McLeod [D] | Rep. Viola Davis [D] | Rep. Bee Nguyen [D] |
Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - House - Election Of Speaker Of The House: House Vote #2 (Y: 158 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-14 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-16 | House | House Prefiled |