GA HR158 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by general law for the dedication of revenues derived from fees or taxes to the public purpose for which such fees or taxes were imposed; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for the redesignation of a current subparagraph of the Constitution; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; provide for dedication of revenues derived from fees or other taxes to the public purpose for which such fees or other taxes were imposed; authorize - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #501 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-01-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hopper |