GA HR1430 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION encouraging the United States Air Force (USAF) to deploy F-35 fighter jets to military air bases located in the State of Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
United States Air Force; deploy F-35 fighter jets to military air bases in Georgia; encourage
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #777 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2018-03-07 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53474 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/175859 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53474#16172 |