GA HR1417 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on Cultivation, Manufacture, and Dispensing of Medical Cannabis Low THC Oil; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Study Committee on Cultivation, Manufacture, and Dispensing of Medical Cannabis Low THC Oil; create
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] |
Rep. David Clark [R] | Rep. Vernon Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2018-03-05 | House | House Hopper |