GA HR14 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the National Statuary Hall Collection Replacement Committee; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Statuary Hall Collection Replacement Committee; create

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-01-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-14HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-13HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback