GA HR1376 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the House Rural Development Council to solicit input from the hospitals in this state on the financial conditions of such hospitals; and for other purposes.
Title
House Rural Development Council; solicit input from hospitals in the state on the financial conditions of such hospitals; urge
Sponsors
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House Vote #695 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53371 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/175394 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53371#16003 |