GA HR1363 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the United States Congress to amend the Controlled Substances Act of 1970 so as to reclassify marijuana as a Schedule II drug so that its medical benefits and effects may be researched or, if Congress is unwilling to reclassify marijuana, to enact the Marijuana Effective Drug Study Act (MEDS Act); and for other purposes.
Title
United States Congress; amend Controlled Substances Act of 1970 to reclassify marijuana as a Schedule II drug; urge
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Rep. Vernon Jones [D] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] |
Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #706 (Y: 158 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-26 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53338 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/175227 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53338#16023 |