GA HR130 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-05-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-05-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION ratifying the action of the Board of Community Affairs approving of the transfer of Forsyth County from the Georgia Mountains Regional Commission to the Atlanta Regional Commission.
Title
Board of Community Affairs; approving transfer of Forsyth County from Georgia Mountains Regional Commission to Atlanta Regional Commission; ratify action
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren McDonald [R] | Rep. Todd Jones [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Will Wade [R] |
Rep. Sheri Gilligan [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #403 (Y: 160 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Adoption By Substitute: Senate Vote #328 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Adopt: House Vote #155 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Adoption By Substitute: Senate Vote #328 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Adopt: House Vote #155 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Effective Date 2021-05-10 | |
2021-05-10 | Act 296 | |
2021-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-10 | House | House Hopper |