GA HR1280 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on Childhood Lead Exposure; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Study Committee on Childhood Lead Exposure; create
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Rep. Pam Dickerson [D] |
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57773 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/191009 |