GA HR1215 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing Judge Willie J. Lovett, Jr., and dedicating a building in his memory; and for other purposes.
Title
Judge Willie J. Lovett, Jr., Juvenile Justice Center; City of Savannah; dedicate
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Craig Gordon [D] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House Hopper |