GA HR120 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Motor Vehicle Crimes; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Study Committee on Motor Vehicle Crimes; create

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-02-18HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-10HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-09HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback