GA HR1198 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the United States Congress to increase the per diem rate for nursing care in state veterans homes to 75 percent of the state private nursing rates; and for other purposes.
Title
United States Congress; increase per diem rate for nursing care in state veteran homes to 75 percent of state private nursing rates; urge
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Rep. Darrel Ealum [D] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. David Clark [R] |
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Brian Prince [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #774 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52932 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/173797 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52932#16169 |