GA HR1183 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Act 589
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide that the General Assembly by general law may impose additional penalties or fees for the offense of reckless driving and may provide for the allocation of such additional penalties or fees to the Brain and Spinal Injury Trust Fund, as provided by law, for the specified purpose of meeting any and all costs, or any portion of the costs, of providing care and rehabilitative services to citizens of this state who have survived neurotrauma with head or spinal cord injuries; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Assembly; additional penalties or fees for reckless driving and provide allocation of fees to the Brain and Spinal Injury Trust Fund; impose - CA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #668 (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #831 (Y: 147 N: 6 NV: 13 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #658 (Y: 157 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-22 Act 589
2014-04-22HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2014-03-26HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2014-03-18HouseHouse Agrees Senate Amend or Sub
2014-03-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2014-03-18SenateSenate Third Read
2014-03-18SenateSenate Taken from Table
2014-03-18SenateSenate Tabled
2014-03-13SenateSenate Read Second Time
2014-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2014-03-04SenateSenate Read and Referred
2014-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2014-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2014-02-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2014-02-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2014-01-31HouseHouse First Readers
2014-01-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback