GA HR117 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Homeowners' Associations, Condominium Owners' Associations, and Property Owners in Community Associations; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Homeowners' Associations, Condominium Owners' Associations, and Property Owners in Community Associations; create
Sponsors
Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] | Rep. Mandisha Thomas [D] |
Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-08 | House | House Hopper |